+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 48
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2013
- Reset on Reg cal. for 3/7/13
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/28/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/19/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/13/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.