+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 281
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/24/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/4/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (9)
April 24, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 24, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 24, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87