+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 227
- Effective date(s) 04/30/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0236)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0166)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97