+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor