+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2018
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 4/4/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 4/4/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/28/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/21/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor