+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed Behind the Budget
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0340
Amendment 1-0 to HB0517
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 26, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor