+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 428
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2021
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/17/2021
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/9/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (6)
April 27, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
April 27, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 26, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 21, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 9, 2021: HOUSE INSURANCE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 2, 2021: INSURANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor