+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Failed In s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 26, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor