+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 6/3/2020
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
- Ref. to State Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (27)
+ − Votes (22)
May 8, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: Motion for Special Order THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 TO AMENDMENT # 22 MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 5, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 TO AMENDMENT # 22 MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 5, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 5, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Matlock PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 20 BY Clemmons PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 21 BY Sparks PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 13 BY Hill M. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 18 BY Kumar PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 11 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 13 BY Hill M. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Matlock PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY Rogers PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 9 BY Sexton J. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 13 BY Hill M. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 2
May 3, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 2, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor