+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 88
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/14/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
March 23, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 23, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 14, 2017: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 14, 2017: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 8, 2017: HOUSE INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
March 8, 2017: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor