+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/26/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 26, 2021: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor