+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/27/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 26, 2021: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor