+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/16/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2016: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 8, 2016: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor