+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 115
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3-21-19
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3-18-19
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/11/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar
March 11, 2019: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor