+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to last calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/9/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 4/9/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/19/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/13/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0401
Amendment 1-0 to HB0484