+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 294
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/1/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 1, 2019: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor