+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
- Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/22/17
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor