+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 201
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/31/2015
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- Ref. to State Government Committee
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 6, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 6, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 6, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 31, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 31, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 25, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
March 25, 2015: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor