+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 368
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 18, 2019: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor