+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 113
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/4/2019
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/25/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 4, 2019: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor