+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 03/28/2022
- Pub. Ch. 676
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/6/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/30/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
March 14, 2022: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 7
April 14, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 14, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 6, 2021: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2021: HOUSE PUBLIC SERVICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor