+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 73
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/23/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/11/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/3/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (8)
March 23, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 1
March 23, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 23, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 23, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 11, 2015: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 11, 2015: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 3, 2015: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
March 3, 2015: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor