+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
- Pub. Ch. 343
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0333)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0515)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
- Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2013
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2013
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/9/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 30
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89