+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 587
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/24/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/16/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
- Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
- Ref. to Education Administration
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
May 4, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
May 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 24, 2021: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 16, 2021: HOUSE HIGHER EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor