+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/11/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/5/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/26/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/20/2013
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2013: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
February 26, 2013: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 20, 2013: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor