+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 1/27/2016
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 1/1/2016
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
- Reset on Final cal. of Transportation Subcommittee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee--Finance
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor