+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/23/2022
- Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Public Service Subcommittee
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/16/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/16/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/9/2022
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 1/26/2022
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor