+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 427
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/2/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/19/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass if am; ref to Criminal Justice Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/11/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Criminal
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.