+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 5
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0149)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0134)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2013
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/6/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2013
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 21, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 5
March 14, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 13, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 6, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor