+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 438
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/9/2017
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means for 5/1/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Study Subcommittee
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/11/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
- Move to Heel
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
May 9, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for
May 9, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for
May 8, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 8, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 8, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
May 8, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
May 1, 2017: STUDY SUBCOMMITTEE OF FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
May 1, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS STUDY SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 11, 2017: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 11, 2017: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 5, 2017: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
April 5, 2017: HOUSE HEATH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor