+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor