+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 367
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/19
- Reset on cal. for 5/1/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Action deferred to License Change Calendar
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 2/6/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 1/30/2019
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
On January 19, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 30, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 24, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 24, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 6, 2019: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
January 30, 2019: HOUSE CONSTITUTIONAL PROTECTIONS & SENTENCING SUBCOMMITTEE:
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor