+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 375
- Effective date(s) 05/08/2015
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, 2, & 3 HB0041
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/20/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0427)
- Motion to reconsider adopted.
- Motion to lift from the table.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/16/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2015
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0299)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0300)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0044)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/11/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Meeting Cancelled. Reset on Criminal Justice Subcommittee cal. for next meeting.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: 1, 2, & 3 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS
April 6, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 33
March 26, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
March 11, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 11, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 3, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
March 3, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor