+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to lottery calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/12/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/19/2013
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0228
Amendment 1-0 to HB0402