+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 152
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/16/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
- Ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 16, 2021: HOUSE COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 10, 2021: HOUSE BANKING AND CONSUMER AFFAIRS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor