+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 162
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/4/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Move to Heel
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/22/2017
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/22/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/15/2017
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/15/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/8/2017
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/8/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/1/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2017
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 16, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.