+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/27/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor