+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0352)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0271)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/31/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Sponsor change.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.