+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 556
- Effective date(s) 03/21/2014
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 79, Nays 0
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/3/2014
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- S. adopted am. 1
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/12/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 79
February 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 30
March 21, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 14, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 12, 2013: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
March 6, 2013: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor