+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 225
- Effective date(s) 04/30/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/26/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Commerce Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/12/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Commerce Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/5/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Utilities Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (9)
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
April 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2019: HOUSE COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 27, 2019: HOUSE UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
May 4, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 26, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 26, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 18, 2017: HOUSE TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 15, 2017: HOUSE SAFETY & FUNDING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor