+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/9/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/24/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 24, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor