+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 267
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2013
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/3/2013
- Action Def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 4/3/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/27/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2013: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE
April 3, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 19, 2013: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor