+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
- Ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor