+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 144
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/17/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 2, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 2, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 17, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 17, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor