+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/12/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor