+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 131
- Effective date(s) 04/09/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/14/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/5/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
On January 19, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 14, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 1
March 14, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 5, 2019: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 26, 2019: HOUSE FACILITIES, LICENSURE, & REGULATIONS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor