+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/3/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2013
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 3, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 26, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor