+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/2013
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2013
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed Behind the Budget
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/27/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.