+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 492
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019; 01/01/2020
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. comm. appointed. ( Daniel, Sanderson, Lafferty)
- H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/2/19
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee appointed. (Bowling, Reeves, Rose)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 74, Nays 0 PNV 0
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to recede from amendment 1
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 5/1/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1
- H. Placed on Message Calendar 3 for 4/30/19
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0355)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0152)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/1/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/26/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/12/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/5/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
May 2, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 95
May 2, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report
- Yeas: 8
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
April 10, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 10, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
April 1, 2019: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 26, 2019: HOUSE COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
February 26, 2019: HOUSE BUSINESS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor