+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 419
- Effective date(s) 05/21/2019
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0322)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0338)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
April 22, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 10, 2019: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 2, 2019: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor